George v. City of Buffalo
Plaintiff: William M. George
Defendant: City of Buffalo
Case Number: 1:2009cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 97 Report and Recommendations consistent with this Decision and Order. (Clerk to close case.) Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/31/17. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Foschio's decision and order. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 6/3/2011. (JMB)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECISION and ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend or Correct; denying 20 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff shall file and serve the Amended Complaint within 10 days of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/31/2011. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. City of Buffalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. George
Represented By: Dean M. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Buffalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?