Armstrong Pump, Inc. v. Hartman et al
Plaintiff: Armstrong Pump, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas Hartman and Optimum Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00446
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 291 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Optimum Energy LLC; 290 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hartman; and 292 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc.Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 1/18/2018. (GAI)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 DECISION AND ORDER setting 12/21/2017 deadline for optional supplemental briefing.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/7/2017. (GAI)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 DECISION and ORDER SETTING ASIDE, the 324 Report and Recommendation; RECOMMITTING this matter to the Magistrate Judge; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the parties' 333 334 335 Objections. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/26/2017. (MEAL)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 290 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hartman; 291 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Optimum Energy LLC; and 292 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc.Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 9/8/2017. (GAI)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 271 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/13/2016. (GAI)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 242 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/3/2016. (GAI)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion for Discovery.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/9/2014. (GAI)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting 192 Motion for Attorney FeesDefendant Optimum Energy's application to recover its reasonable motion expenses is granted. This Court finds that the amount claimed, $4,482.50, is reasonable. Defendant Optimum Energy is awarded $4,482.50 payable by plaintiff and its attorneys. Court Clerk to enter judgment for this motion award.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/15/2014. (DRH)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 180 Amended MOTION to Compel Depositions and Privilege Logs (Corrected Version of Docket No. 178 to include inadvertently omitted pages 2 and 3 of Notice of Motion) filed by Optimum Energy LLC, 176 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc. THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Plaintiff� 39;s Motion to Compel (Docket No. 176) is granted, but its application to recover its reasonable motion expenses is denied. Defendant Optimum Energy's Cross-Motion (Docket No. 180) to Compel is granted in part, deemed moot in part. Its applica tion to recover its motion expenses will be considered; Optimum Energy may submit its application by 6/30/2014; plaintiff may respond by 7/7/2014.Patent case mediation is terminated (see Docket No. 174).The resolution of these motions, t he scheduling order is restarted upon the following deadlines: Motions to Compel Discovery due by 8/22/2014, Discovery completed by 9/22/2014.Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2014.Mediation To End by 1/5/2015.If no dispositive motions a re filed, Status Report due by 1/5/2015. Status Conference set for Wed., 1/14/2015, 2:00 PM, at the Genesee Courtroom, Robert H. Jackson U.S. Courthouse before Hon. Hugh B. Scott, to consider the trial readiness of this action and to report re sults to Chief Judge Skretny. If dispositive motions are filed, this status report and Status Conference will be adjourned.Motions terminated: 180 Amended MOTION to Compel Depositions and Privilege Logs (Corrected Version of Docket No. 1 78 to include inadvertently omitted pages 2 and 3 of Notice of Motion) filed by Optimum Energy LLC, 176 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/23/2014. (DRH)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING in part and SETTING aside in part the 136 Report and Recommendation. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/7/2013. (MEAL)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting 99 Motion to CompelDefendant Optimum Energy's discovery sanctions application due by 6/21/2012, plaintiff's response due by 7/2/2012 and application deemed submitted (without oral argument) on 7/2/2012.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/11/2012. (DRH)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 97 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 68 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, of Patent Invalidity filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc.Plaintiff's motion to amend its Answer to Counterclaim (Docket No. 97) is granted without precondition. Armstrong Pump, Inc. answer due 5/21/2012, Replies due by 6/5/2012.Scheduling Conference set for Tues., 6/26/2012, 10:30 AM, be fore Hon. Hugh B. Scott with Status Conference set for 6/26/2012, 10:30 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott. Motions terminated: 97 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 68 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, of Patent Invalidity filed by Armstrong Pump, Inc. So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 5/15/2012. (DRH)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECISION AND ORDER ACCEPTING and MODIFYING Magistrate Judge Scott's 84 Report and Recommendation; GRANTING Defendant Optimum Energy LLC's 70 Motion to Dismiss Armstrong's Amended Counterclaim for Patent Invalidity; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant Optimum Energy LLC's 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/25/2012. (MEAL)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant Hartman's 15 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant 17 Optimum Energy's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Plaintiff Armstrong's 18 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; DENYING as moot Plaintiff Armstrong's 19 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/7/2010. (MEAL)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECISON AND ORDER DENYING Defendant Hartman's 15 Motion to Dismiss to the extent it seeks dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue and HOLDING IT IN ABEYANCE to the extent it seeks dismissal for failure to state a claim; DENYING Defendant Optimum Energy's 17 Motion to Dismiss to the extent it seeks dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction and HOLDING IT IN ABEYANCE to the extent it seeks dismissal for failure to state a claim; GRANTING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order pending the earlier of a determination on Armstrong's 18 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, or the expiration of fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order (unless otherwise extended an additiona l fourteen (14) days under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65); RESTRAINING Defendant Hartman from selling to Optimum the patents covered by the License Agreement between Armstrong and Hartman; INFORMING the parties that a hearing date on the preliminary injunction will be set by further Order, if necessary and that the remaining arguments in Defendants' 15 17 Motions to Dismiss will be addressed in conjunction with the 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/9/2010. (MEAL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong Pump, Inc. v. Hartman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armstrong Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?