Davis v. Rynkewicz et al
Plaintiff: Lavar Davis
Defendant: Jason Rynkewicz, Steven Casaceli, Anthony Theriault, S. Furlani, Thomas Sticht and Albert Prack
Case Number: 1:2011cv00431
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Seneca
Presiding Judge: H. Kenneth Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER directing NYSDOCCS to permit telephone conferences between plaintiff and pro bono counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 9/8/2016. (KER)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER granting 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 1/13/2016. (KER)(Mailed to Plaintiff)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Captain Casaceli, Sergeant Theriault, Education Supervisor Furlani and Director Prack as defendants in this action. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 3/10/2015. (KER)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to plaintiff's discovery demands and for clarification of Court's screening order filed by Jason Rynkewicz, S. Furlani, Steven Casaceli, Anthony Theriault. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 1/14/2013. (KER)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Rynkewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavar Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rynkewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Casaceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Theriault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Furlani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Prack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?