Small v. The State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Small
Defendant: The State of New York, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Attica Correctional Facility, Carl Cuer, James Conway and Sandra Dolce
Case Number: 1:2012cv01236
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to file an amended judgment as specified. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 5/29/2019. (MEAL)- CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 204 206 post-trial motions; ADVISING that a new trial on damages against Defendant Carl Cuer will be scheduled by separate order if Plaintiff does not accept this Court& #039;s remittitur of compensatory damages against Defendant Cuer from $3.85 million to $2.88 million; DIRECTING Plaintiff to file an affidavit within 10 days of the entry date of this Decision and Order advising whether she will accept the remittitur; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiff's 202 Motion for Attorneys Fees, Interest, and Costs; DIRECTING Defendants to pay Plaintiff $862,395.30 in attorneys' fees, $364,622.14 in pre-judgment interest, and & #036;100,448.72 in costs; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to file an amended judgment against Defendants New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Sandra Dolce, and James Conway as specified; ADVISING that the amended judgment may be amended further to include Defendant Cuer once Plaintiff notifies this Court of her remittitur decision. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 4/14/2019. (MEAL) - CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendant Carl Cuer's 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Defendants James Conway Sandra Dolce's 87 Motion for Summary Judgment as the federal claims and GRANTING it as to the state law claims. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 3/30/2017. (MEAL)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECISION AND ORDER granting 74 Motion to Compel Defendants to Participate in Mediation. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/26/15. (DAZ)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION AND ORDER granting defendant Cuer's motion 56 to compel; denying 59 plaintiff's cross-motion. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/26/15. (DAZ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. The State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Small
Represented By: Jennifer A. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attica Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Cuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Dolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?