Vanlier v. Takhar Collection Services, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Vanlier
Defendant: Takhar Collection Services, LTD. and DOE 1-5
Case Number: 1:2013cv00443
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John T. Curtin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ---CLERK TO FOLLOW UP---DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 36 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hardial S. Takhar and Sukcharn S. Takhar. Plaintiff is awarded $500.00 for Defendants' violation of the FDCPA, $2,904.83 in attorney's fees, and $363.61 in costs. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 3/24/2016.(JEC)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP---DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendants' [27, 28] MOTIONS to Vacate 27 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/25/2014. (JEC)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP---DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendants' Motion 15 MOTION to Vacate 7 Clerk's Entry of Default. The court has been informed that plaintiff and defendants Financial Debt and FDR have reached a settlement. The parties are forthwith directed to file a stipulation of dismissal in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 1/15/2014. (JEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanlier v. Takhar Collection Services, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Vanlier
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takhar Collection Services, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?