Scott-Iverson v. Independent Health Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dawn Scott-Iverson
Defendant: Independent Health Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00451
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's 163 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED; Defendant's motion for sanctions 166 is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/16/2017. (SDW)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's Request and Defendant's Supplemental Request for attorneys fees in the amount of $15,413.48 is GRANTED. Payment thereof to Defendant shall be made within 30 days of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/31/2017. (SDW)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 DECISION AND ORDER re 125 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Defendant's Request is GRANTED; Defendant shall file its affidavit of costs within 20 days; Plaintiff's response shall be filed within 10 days thereafter. Defendant's reply may be filed within 5 days thereafter. Oral argument shall be at the courts discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2017. (SDW)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 AMENDED DECISION AND ORDER re 112 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Contempt, Sanctions and Other Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Independent Health Association, Inc. The fines levied herein against Housh, Plaintiffs counsel, in the amount of $4,800 shall be paid to the Clerk of Court within 30 days. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/4/2017. (SDW) (This D&O amends the D&O filed 12/15/2016, Dkt. 125)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Sanctions. The fines levied herein against Housh, Plaintiff's counsel, in the amount of $4,700 shall be paid to the Clerk of Court within 30 days. Plaintiff shall s how cause within 20 days of this Decision and Order why the expenses, including reasonable attorneys fees, incurred by Defendant in connection with Defendant's motion should not be awarded against Plaintiff, Plaintiff's counsel or both. The parties shall submit, jointly or individually, a proposed fourth amended scheduling order within five days of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/15/2016. (SDW)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's request (Dkt. 92) for an award of expenses including reasonable attorneys fees in successfully opposing Plaintiff's motion pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its affidavit of such expenses within 30 days of the filing of this Decision and Order; Plaintiff's response shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; Defendants reply, if any, may be filed within 5 days of Plaintiff's response. Oral argument shall be at the courts discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/12/2016. (SDW)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion (Dkt. 88) is DENIED without prejudice to filing a further motion to compel compliant with Rule 37(a)(1) and Local R.Civ.P. 7(a) including a designation of Defendant's responses which Plaintiff believe s to be unresponsive or improperly asserting an objection, and a concise explanation of why Defendant's responses are unsatisfactory together with a memorandum of law in support. Pursuant to Rule 37(B)(5), Plaintiff shall show cause why Defenda nt's attorneys fees incurred in successfully opposing Plaintiff's motion should not be awarded to Defendant. Plaintiffs papers shall be filed not later than 7/6/2016; Defendant's response shall be filed not later than 7/18/2016. Oral argument shall be at the court's discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/23/2016. (SDW)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's application for attorneys fees in relation to Defendant's motion to compel Plaintiff's deposition is GRANTED in the amount of $4,787.73 to be paid by Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/21/2016. (SDW)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's application for expenses in connection with Defendant motion (Dkt. 87) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file Defendant's statement of its attorneys fees and costs within 30 days; Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. A hearing on Defendant's application will be scheduled at the discretion of the court. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/14/2016. (SDW)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DECISION and ORDER granting 80 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion. A Third Amended Scheduling Order will be simultaneously filed with this Decision and Order. Plaintiff shall show cause why Defendants deposition costs and those incurred in connection with Defendant's motion should not be awarded pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 37(a)(5) and (d)(1). Plaintiff's showing shall be filed not later than 14 days from the date of this Decision and Order; Defendant's response shall be filed not later than five days thereafter. Oral argument shall be at the court's discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/1/2016. (SDW)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Adopting Magistrate Judge H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr.'s Report and Recommendation 18 as filed on March 19, 2014. Based on the reasons outlined in the attached Order, the defendant's motion to dismiss 5 is granted in part and den ied in part. Plaintiff's first and second causes of action may proceed. Plaintiff's third cause of action, alleging retaliation, is dismissed. The matter is referred back to Judge Schroeder for further proceedings. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 7/7/14. (LAS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott-Iverson v. Independent Health Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Scott-Iverson
Represented By: Frank T. Housh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Health Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?