Hatemi v. M&T Bank Corporation
Plaintiff: Lachin Hatemi
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv01103
Filed: November 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-DECISION AND ORDER staying case pending arbitration and directing administrative closing. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/6/2016. (GAI)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECISION AND ORDER granting 68 Motion to Amend or Correct. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/24/2015. (GAI)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion for Permissive Joinder. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/5/2015. (GAI)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECISION AND ORDER declining to stay proceedings pending appeal.Per order, responding papers to pending motions (Dkt. Nos. 42, 50) due by 2/4/2015. Reply papers due by 2/13/2015. Oral argument at Court's discretion.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 1/15/2015. (GAI)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by M&T Bank Corporation.Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/3/2014. (GAI)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatemi v. M&T Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lachin Hatemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Lane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?