Nelson v. Gleason et al
Plaintiff: Lionell Nelson
Defendant: Larry Gleason, Carleton Brink and Gary Belz
Case Number: 1:2014cv00870
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Cayuga
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 63 Text Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 87 MOTION for Discovery Reopen Discovery filed by Lionell Nelson< /b>Plaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 87) to reopen discovery is granted; Motions terminated: 87 MOTION for Discovery Reopen Discovery filed by Lionell Nelson.As a result, Amended Scheduling Order (Docket No. 63) is amended as follows: Discovery completed by 6/27/2018, Motions due by 9/25/2018.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/29/2018. (DRH)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER finding as moot 42 Motion ; denying 42 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel; denying 50 Motion ; denying 62 Mo tion to CompelPlaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 42) denied as moot, save production of a duplicate copy of defense initial disclosure filed with the Court. Court Clerk is instructed to copy and send to plaintiff defendants' in itial disclosures (Docket Nos. 28, 36).Plaintiff's remaining discovery motions (Docket Nos. 50, 62) are denied.Defendants' motion to extend their time to respond to 5/15/2017 (Docket No. 45, Defs. Atty. Decl. 4) is granted, nunc pro tunc.Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff at Clinton Correctional Facility by Chambers.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/13/2017. (DRH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECISION AND ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott's Order 25 denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the denial of entry of default. The case is referred back to Judge Scott for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 2/7/17. (LAS)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration re 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Lionell Nelson, 20 Requ est for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Lionell NelsonPlaintiff's Motion (termed one for reconsideration) for Entry of Default(Docket No. 22) is denied.Defendants to re-serve the Answer within 10 days of entry of this Order.Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff at Clinton Correctional Facility by Chambers.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/22/2016. (DRH)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER finding as moot 5 Motion for Permanent Injunction; finding as moot 5 Motion for TRO; finding as moot 5 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 7 Motion for Service by US Marshal; granting 8 Motion to CompelPlaintiff's time to serve defendants is extended. Pursuant to Valentin v. Dinkins, 121 F.3d 72 (2d Cir. 1997) (per curiam), New York State Attorney General's Office is to provide the addresses of defendants and provide this information by 5/27/2016.Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 6) is denied without prejudice at this time.Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff at Clinton Correctional Facility by Chambers.Court Clerk is to send a copy of this Order to the Assistant Attorney General in Charge, Buffalo Regional Office. Court Clerk is asked to update plaintiff's address at the Clinton Correctional Facility.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/12/2016. (DRH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Gleason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionell Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carleton Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Belz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?