Black v. Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood et al
Plaintiff: Darcy M Black
Defendant: Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood, Robert Seibert, Diane Seibert and Keegan Roberts
Case Number: 1:2015cv00049
Filed: January 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Niagara
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DECISION AND ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 106) is GRANTED. FURTHER, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 5/21/2021. (JCM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECISION AND ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion to Strike (Docket No. 114) is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 2/26/2021. (JCM)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 70 Motion to Strike 67 MOTION to Compel, to Obtain an Award of Reasonable Expenses, and for Sanctions, 70 MOTION to Strike 69 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 69 MOTION for Attorney FeesDefendants' Motion (Docket No. 67) to compel is gra nted in part, denied in part; plaintiff's deposition is to resume but for up to 1 1/2 hours and scope as defined in this Order. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion (Docket No. 69) is granted in part, denied in part. Apportionment of discovery sancti ons deferred until the conclusion of this action. Defendants' Motion (Docket No. 70) to strike is denied.Seventh Amended Scheduling Order included in this Order (and to be separately refiled).So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment: excerpt of Plaintiff's Transcript, pages 299-308, Docket No. 67, Defs. Atty. Affirm., Ex. A) (DRH)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting 50 Motion for Attorney FeesPlaintiff's motion for attorney's fees is granted in part, plaintiff is awarded $4,220.00 against defendants and their counsel jointly. Defendants' cross-motion (Docket No. 51) to recover their motion costs is denied. Court Clerk to enter judgment as to this attorney's fee award.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/3/2017. (DRH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 40 Order, Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions, 42 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boul evard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood, 47 Text Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines, Terminate Motions, Motions terminated: 42 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed b y Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood.Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Docket No. 42) of previous Order (Docket No. 40) is granted. As a resul t, plaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 34) to compel is granted; defendants' Cross-Motion (Docket No. 36) to compel is granted in part, and deemed moot where plaintiff has produced, as specified in this Order. Specifically, plaintiff is to prod uce her redacted tax returns. Plaintiff's earlier motion (Docket No. 28) remains denied.The Fourth Amended Scheduling Order (Docket No. 40) deadlines remain as ordered. Plaintiff's expert disclosure due 9/29/2017; defense expert disclosure due 10/30/2017.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/23/2017. (DRH)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 33 Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines,, Set Deadlines, 34 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION t o Expedite filed by Darcy M Black, 36 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood, 32 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Plaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 34) to compel is granted; defen dant's Cross-Motion (Docket No. 36) is granted in part, denied in party and deemed moot where plaintiff has produced (as indicated in this Order).Plaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 34) to extend the Scheduling Order (Docket Nos. 32, 33) is g ranted. As a result, Plaintiff Expert Witness ID now due by 6/29/2017, Motions to Compel Discovery due by 7/14/2017, Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/28/2017, Discovery completed by 8/14/2017. Dispositive Motions now due by 11/13/2017. Mediation To End by 12/5/2017.If no dispositive motions are filed, Status Report due by 12/5/2017. Status Conference set for Wed., 12/13/2017, 10:30 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott.Motions terminated: 34 MOTION to Compel MO TION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION to Expedite filed by Darcy M Black, 36 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/31/2017. (DRH)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Expedite; granting 28 Motion to Compel; granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryScheduling Order amended (and to be entered in a separate Order).So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/29/2016. (DRH)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 22 Text Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Deadlines, 23 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite MOTION for E xtension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Interrogatories filed by Darcy M Black, Motions terminated: 23 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Extension of Time to Co mplete Discovery MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Interrogatories filed by Darcy M Black,SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Plaintiff's Motion (Docket No. 23) to compel is granted in part, denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion (id.) to extended the Scheduling Order deadlines is granted. As a result, Plaintiff Expert Witness ID now due by 10/31/2016, Motions to Compel Discovery due by 11 /15/2016, Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 11/30/2016, Discovery completed by 12/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2017.Mediation To End by 3/23/2017.If no dispositive motions are filed, Status Report due by 3/23/2017. Status Conference set for Wed., 4/12/2017, 10:30 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/16/2016. (DRH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy M Black
Represented By: Josephine A. Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Meat Service, Inc. d/b/a Boulevard Black Angus a/k/a Black Angus Meats a/k/a Black Angus Meats & Seafood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keegan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?