CRA Holdings US, Inc. and Subsidiaries v. United States Government
Plaintiff: CRA Holdings US, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00239
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Wolford
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECISION AND ORDER denying as moot 122 Objections; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Voluntary Partial Dismissal; denying 135 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; denying as moot 136 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 140 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/19/2019. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DISMISSING as moot 124 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay this court's Decision and Order filed August 22, 2018 (Dkt. 121), granting Defendant's motion to compel discovery. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 09/25/2018. (TAH)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECISION and ORDER. Defendant's motion (Dkt. 95) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall provide satisfactory responses to Defendant's Fourth Set Interrogatories Nos. 10 and 11 within 30 days. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/22/2018. (SDW)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Compel 72 is DISMISSED in part, and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs shall show cause within 10 days of this Decision and Order why Defendant's expenses incurred in connection with Defendant's Mot ion to Compel should not, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a)(5)(A), be granted; Defendant's response shall be filed within 10 days thereafter; Plaintiffs' reply, if any, may be filed within five days after Defendants response. Oral argument shall be at the courts discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/12/2018. (SDW)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION AND ORDER. The parties are directed to proceed to select a random sample of Plaintiffs' projects in accordance with the Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/9/2017. (SDW)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION AND ORDER denying 52 Motion for Sanctions; granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall meet and confer and within 10 days of this Decision and Order and submit jointly or individually proposed amended scheduling orders governing further proceedings in this case. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/18/2017. (SDW) (Main Document 63 replaced on 5/18/2017) (SDW).
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendant's Motion to Compel; Plaintiffs' motion 33 is denied. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/26/2017. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRA Holdings US, Inc. and Subsidiaries v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRA Holdings US, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Represented By: John H. Dies
Represented By: Jefferson H. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?