Bauman v. 2810026 Canada Limited Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Bauman
Defendant: 2810026 Canada Limited, 2810034 Canada Limited, Frederick Group Inc. and Singh Amarjit
Case Number: 1:2015cv00374
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECISION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS IN PART and MODIFIES IN PART Judge Foschio's R&Rs (ECF No. 86 in 13-CV-901 and ECF No. 71 in 15-CV-374). Corporate Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF No. 87 in 13-CV-901 and ECF No. 56 in 15-C V-374) are GRANTED; Roth's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 71 in 13-CV-901) is DENIED; Bauman's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 70 in 13-CV-901) is DENIED; the Corporate Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 49 in 15-CV-374) is DENIED AS MOOT; the claims against Defendant Singh are dismissed pursuant to Rule 56(f)(1); and the cross-claims brought by Defendants are dismissed as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in both actions and close the cases. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/14/2020. (MFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECISION AND ORDER. Defendants' motions to enforce sanctions (Dkt. 67), is DISMISSED as moot; Defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. 70), is DISMISSED as moot and as premature. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/3/2017. (SDW)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION AND ORDER re 34 Decision and Order. As Plaintiff has to date failed to comply with the court's direction to file Plaintiff's affidavit of expenses as stated in the October 4, 2016 D&O, Plaintiff's request is deemed to have been WAIVED. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/12/2017. (SDW)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECISION AND ORDER. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(A) and Rule 37(d)(3), Defendants' counsel shall pay Plaintiffs' reasonable expenses, including attorneys fees, incurred in connection with Plaintiffs' motion. Plaintiffs shall submit Plain tiffs' attorney's affidavit detailing such expenses, based on contemporaneous time-records and Plaintiffs' attorney's billing rates, within 30 days of this Decision and Order; Defendants' opposition, if any, shall be filed within 15 days thereafter; Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed within 5 days thereafter. Oral argument shall be at the courts discretion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/4/2016. (SDW)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECISION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce the requested authorization forms within 15 days of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/3/2016. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauman v. 2810026 Canada Limited Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Bauman
Represented By: David W. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2810026 Canada Limited
Represented By: Mary Jones
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2810034 Canada Limited
Represented By: Mary Jones
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Group Inc.
Represented By: Mary Jones
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Amarjit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?