Ocasio et al v. Azamzhanovich et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ocasio and Danny Ocasio
Defendant: Avazzhon N. Azamzhanovich, Velocity Trans Inc. and General Lease, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00620
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Frank P. Geraci
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court adopts United States Magistrate Judge Jeremiah J. McCarthys 18 Report and Recommendation in full, and this action is hereby REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie . The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit this Decision and Order to the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, and close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/2/18. (JO)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 13 Order to Show Cause. Any objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed with the clerk of the court by March 1, 2018. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/15/18. (DAZ)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/6/17. (JO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocasio et al v. Azamzhanovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ocasio
Represented By: Cherie L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ocasio
Represented By: Cherie L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avazzhon N. Azamzhanovich
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Trans Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Lease, LLC
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?