Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tara Lynn Sullivan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00871
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tara Lynn Sullivan re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Pusatier, Stephen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(NRE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. Plaintiff's attorney shall perform the service of papers in this matter, which may be done by certified mail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/30/2018. (NRE)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Laura Lechleitner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
August 8, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
August 8, 2018 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (NRE)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tara Lynn Sullivan.(Pusatier, Stephen)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tara Lynn Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Atty General, #2 Exhibit Summons Region Chief Council, #3 Exhibit Summons US Atty, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pusatier, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Andreea Laura Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Lynn Sullivan
Represented By: Stephen F. Pusatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?