Morgan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Morgan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00884
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Niagara
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (KM)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service of papers, which may be done by certified mail, shall be performed by the plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/30/2018. (KM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Parkerson Peck on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Peck, Jason)
August 10, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
August 10, 2018 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (KM)
August 10, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding case caption on docket. The caption has been corrected to list the defendant as the Commissioner of Social Security. For future reference, please note that the Courts naming conventions are posted on our Public Web Site under CM/ECF Information. When opening social security cases, please enter Commissioner of Social Security in the last name field on your screen and do not include the commissioners actual name in the entry. No additional action by the filer is required on this case. (KM)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Elizabeth Morgan.(Clark, Joseph)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary Elizabeth Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for OGC, US atty and atty gen US, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A UFD, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B AC Denial)(Clark, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jason Parkerson Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Morgan
Represented By: Joseph D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?