Brick v. Ring et al

Plaintiff: Daniel E. Brick
Defendant: John Ring, Jr., Nora Ring, Joseph T. Ring, Granite Tower Capital and John H. Ring, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00932
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by John Ring, Jr, Joseph T. Ring, Nora Ring. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Orlowski, April)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Daniel E. Brick. (Messer, Suzanne)
September 7, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding #2 Letter: This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. The assigned judge does not accept e-filed letter motions. ACTION REQUIRED: Reformat the document and re-file it using the motion event. (KLH)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Letter filed by Daniel E. Brick as to Nora Ring, John Ring, Jr, Joseph T. Ring, Granite Tower Capital, John H. Ring, III requesting the Court issue a briefing schedule allowing Plaintiff until 9-21-18 to file an opposition to defendants' motion to withdraw reference. (Messer, Suzanne)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by John Ring, Jr, Joseph T. Ring, Nora Ring. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brick v. Ring et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ring, Jr.
Represented By: April J. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Ring
Represented By: April J. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Ring
Represented By: April J. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Tower Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Ring, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Brick
Represented By: Suzanne M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?