Hoover, et al. v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Hoover and Leigha Klopp
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00999
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lario, Wendy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Lario, Wendy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Johnson Lario on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lario, Wendy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to the plaintiffs' complaint. Defendants' answer is now due 11/9/2018. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/24/2018. (CMD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Joseph, Linda)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the #6 #7 #8 #9 #10 Motions for Pro Hac Vice for Chad Doellinger, Esq., Julie Gottshall, Esq., Andrew Klevorn, Esq., Laura D. Waller, Esq., and Janet R. Widmaier, Esq. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/28/2018. (CMD)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (Joseph, Linda)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIRMATION signed by Julie L. Gottshall re #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Julie Gottshall ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229247.) filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attorney's Oath). (Joseph, Linda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Janet R. Widmaier ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229351.) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Declaration, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit)(Joseph, Linda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Laura D. Waller ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229330.) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of L. Joseph, #2 Affidavit Application, #3 Affidavit Input Database, #4 Affidavit Civility Principles, #5 Declaration Attorney Oath, #6 Affidavit ECF Registration Form)(Joseph, Linda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Andrew G. Klevorn ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229297.) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of L. Joseph, #2 Affidavit Application, #3 Affidavit Input Sheet, #4 Affidavit Civility Principles, #5 Affidavit ECF Registration Form, #6 Affidavit Attorney Oath)(Joseph, Linda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Julie Gottshall ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229247.) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of L. Joseph, #2 Affidavit Application, #3 Affidavit Oath of Attorney, #4 Affidavit Data Sheet, #5 Affidavit ECF Registration Form)(Joseph, Linda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Chad J. Doellinger ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3229128.) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit L. Joseph Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Oath of civility principles, #3 Affidavit Application, #4 Affidavit Attorney's Oath, #5 Affidavit Doellinger Attorney Database Input Sheet, #6 Affidavit ECF Form)(Joseph, Linda)
September 24, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting defendants' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to the plaintiffs' complaint. Defendants' answer is now due 10/29/2018. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/19/2018. (CMD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Joseph, Linda)
September 14, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
September 14, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Joseph, Linda)
September 14, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (KLH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Removal)(Joseph, Linda)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. Removal from NYS Supreme Court - County of Orleans, case number 18-44970. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3218481), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Appendix Index of Documents filed in State Court)(Joseph, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover, et al. v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Hoover
Represented By: Dina L. Bakst
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Chen
Represented By: Christine T. Dinan
Represented By: Sarah J. Brafman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigha Klopp
Represented By: Dina L. Bakst
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Chen
Represented By: Christine T. Dinan
Represented By: Sarah J. Brafman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Linda H. Joseph
Represented By: Laura D. Waller
Represented By: Andrew G. Klevorn
Represented By: Janet R. Widmaier
Represented By: Julie L. Gottshall
Represented By: Wendy Johnson Lario
Represented By: Chad J. Doellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Linda H. Joseph
Represented By: Laura D. Waller
Represented By: Andrew G. Klevorn
Represented By: Janet R. Widmaier
Represented By: Julie L. Gottshall
Represented By: Wendy Johnson Lario
Represented By: Chad J. Doellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Linda H. Joseph
Represented By: Laura D. Waller
Represented By: Andrew G. Klevorn
Represented By: Janet R. Widmaier
Represented By: Julie L. Gottshall
Represented By: Wendy Johnson Lario
Represented By: Chad J. Doellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?