McKee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Heidi M McKee
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01013
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn Christ on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Christ, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KLH)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the Clerk is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees; and that service of papers, which may be done by certified mail, shall be performed by plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/20/2018. (KLH)
September 17, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
September 17, 2018 E-Filing Notification: regarding case caption on docket. The caption has been corrected to list the defendant as the Commissioner of Social Security. For future reference, please note that the Courts naming conventions are posted on our Public Web Site under CM/ECF Information. When opening social security cases, please enter Commissioner of Social Security in the last name field on your screen and do not include the commissioners actual name in the entry. No additional action by the filer is required on this case.(SG)
September 17, 2018 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool (SG)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Brodsky, Felice)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heidi M McKee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Attorney)(Brodsky, Felice)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Heidi M McKee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AC denial)(Brodsky, Felice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M McKee
Represented By: Felice A. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?