Junior v. Erie County Medical Center

Plaintiff: Diamond Junior
Defendant: Erie County Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv01014
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
0 Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
1 Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 8 MOTION for Service by US Marshal by Diamond Junior.(KM)
October 26, 2018 Summons Reissued as to Erie County Medical Center. (KM)
October 19, 2018 7 TEXT ORDER : Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss #2 shall be served and filed by November 9, 2018, defendant's reply, if any, shall be served and filed by November 19, 2018, after which time the motion will be taken under advisement without oral argument unless requested by one of the parties or deemed necessary by the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/19/18. (Court has mailed a copy of this order to plaintiff).(DAZ)
October 18, 2018 Remark: Chambers mailed a copy of 6 text referral order to pro se plaintiff, Diamond Junior. (CMD)
October 18, 2018 6 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/18/2018. (CMD)
October 12, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Erie County Medical Center re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Cert. of Service of Notice of Motion to Dismiss) (Moldenhauer, Mark)
October 12, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Alexander Collichio) filed by Erie County Medical Center. (Moldenhauer, Mark)
October 12, 2018 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erie County Medical Center. (Moldenhauer, Mark)
October 12, 2018 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Erie County Medical Center.(Moldenhauer, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Erie County Medical Center. (SG)
September 17, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 61435 (SG)
September 14, 2018 Remark: Plaintiff was given a pro se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, and ADR Notification. (KLH)
September 14, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Erie County Medical Center, filed by Diamond Junior. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Junior v. Erie County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Junior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie County Medical Center
Represented By: Mark A. Moldenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?