Diaz Reyes et al v. W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hector Ivan Burgos Rivera, Jose A. Garcia Marrero, Kidanny Josue Martinez Reyes, Rolando Diaz Reyes and Edwin Cosme Colon
Defendant: Mark C. Henry, Henry Realty Associates, Inc., W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc. and Daniel Henry
Case Number: 1:2018cv01017
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:1801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc.. (Jaffe, Chaim)
October 9, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 2, 2018 8 TEXT ORDER. The #7 stipulation for extension of time to answer is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 11/15/2018. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/1/2018. (CMD)
September 28, 2018 7 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer Complaint by Daniel Henry, Mark C. Henry, Henry Realty Associates, Inc., W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc.. (Jaffe, Chaim)
September 28, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Mahr on behalf of All Defendants (Mahr, Douglas)
September 28, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim J. Jaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Jaffe, Chaim)
September 20, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hector Ivan Burgos Rivera, Edwin Cosme Colon, Rolando Diaz Reyes, Jose A. Garcia Marrero, Kidanny Josue Martinez Reyes (Marsella, John)
September 18, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Daniel Henry, Mark C. Henry, Henry Realty Associates, Inc., W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc.. (SG)
September 18, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
September 18, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
September 18, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
September 17, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David McCreanor on behalf of Hector Ivan Burgos Rivera, Edwin Cosme Colon, Rolando Diaz Reyes, Jose A. Garcia Marrero, Kidanny Josue Martinez Reyes (McCreanor, Robert)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Henry, Mark C. Henry, Henry Realty Associates, Inc., W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3220547, filed by Jose A. Garcia Marrero, Hector Ivan Burgos Rivera, Rolando Diaz Reyes, Kidanny Josue Martinez Reyes, Edwin Cosme Colon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marsella, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Reyes et al v. W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Ivan Burgos Rivera
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Garcia Marrero
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kidanny Josue Martinez Reyes
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Diaz Reyes
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Cosme Colon
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Henry
Represented By: Chaim J. Jaffe
Represented By: Douglas J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Realty Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Chaim J. Jaffe
Represented By: Douglas J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. D. Henry & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Chaim J. Jaffe
Represented By: Douglas J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Henry
Represented By: Chaim J. Jaffe
Represented By: Douglas J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?