United States of America v. One 2014 Nissan Rogue et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2014 Nissan Rogue and $18,615.00 United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2018cv01048
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 CLAIM by $18,615.00 United States Currency, One 2014 Nissan Rogue. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date October 25, 2018. (Kaufman, Richard)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to One 2014 Nissan Rogue. (SG)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $18,615.00 United States Currency. (SG)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
September 28, 2018 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 12/18/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (SG)
September 26, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
September 26, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Kaufman on behalf of United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $18,615.00 United States Currency, One 2014 Nissan Rogue, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Kaufman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2014 Nissan Rogue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2014 Nissan Rogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,615.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?