United States of America v. One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck
Case Number: 1:2018cv01091
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 19:1305
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date November 9, 2018. (Kane, Mary)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM Returned Executed as to One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck Vin 1FTFX1CT0DFD04837. (NRE)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 5, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
October 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Ford F-150 Pickup Truck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?