Duhan v. Fuentes et al

Plaintiff: DAVID A DUHAN and David A. Duhan
Defendant: JOHN DOE, GR EQUIPMENT LEASING INC., FUENTES EXPRESS LLC, HIRSCHBACH TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., HIRSCHBACH LOGISTICS, INC., XAVIER E FUENTES, HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES DBA PLATINUM SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS, Xavier E. Fuentes and Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01111
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
0 Judge: Leslie G Foschio
1 Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 10:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/5/2018. (SDW)
November 2, 2018 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Randy Carl Mallaber (Mallaber, Randy)
October 30, 2018 8 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Leslie G. Foschio for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/30/2018. (NRE)
October 26, 2018 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David A. Duhan. (Mallaber, Randy)
October 26, 2018 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Randy C. Mallaber, Esq. is substituted for Anthony J. Tantillo, Esq.. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Mallaber, Randy)
October 12, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
October 12, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
October 11, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GR EQUIPMENT LEASING INC.. (Schechter, Joel)
October 11, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIRSCHBACH LOGISTICS, INC.. (Schechter, Joel)
October 11, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIRSCHBACH TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC.. (Schechter, Joel)
October 11, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES DBA PLATINUM SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS. (Schechter, Joel)
October 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GR EQUIPMENT LEASING INC., HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES DBA PLATINUM SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS, FUENTES EXPRESS LLC, XAVIER E FUENTES, HIRSCHBACH TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., HIRSCHBACH LOGISTICS, INC. from Cattaraugus County Supreme Court, case number 86755. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3244747), filed by GR EQUIPMENT LEASING INC., HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES DBA PLATINUM SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS, FUENTES EXPRESS LLC, XAVIER E FUENTES, HIRSCHBACH TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., HIRSCHBACH LOGISTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Demand for Relief, #4 Exhibit D-Index of Documents, #5 Exhibit E-Not of Filing of Not of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schechter, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duhan v. Fuentes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID A DUHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Duhan
Represented By: Randy Carl Mallaber
Represented By: Anthony J. Tantillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GR EQUIPMENT LEASING INC.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUENTES EXPRESS LLC
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRSCHBACH TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRSCHBACH LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER E FUENTES
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES DBA PLATINUM SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier E. Fuentes
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?