Deering v. Ocwen Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Carl Deering
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01343
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacob, Leah)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carl Deering. (NRE)
December 13, 2018 Remark: Copy of #11 Order mailed to pro se plaintiff. (LB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Opposition papers due by 1/4/2019, replies due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/3/2018. (Entry on docket delayed due to administrative error.) (LB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion Text of Proposed Order (Jacob, Leah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Recorded Mortgage)(Jacob, Leah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jacob, Leah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacob, Leah)
November 27, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
November 27, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
November 27, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Jacob, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Jacob, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Jacob, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc... (Jacob, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Jacob, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Suprem Court,Chautauqua County, case number EK12018001603. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3286769), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice)(Jacob, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deering v. Ocwen Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Deering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Leah Nicole Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Nicole Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Leah Nicole Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?