Hockey Western New York, LLC, et al v. DCR Strategies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hockey Western New York, LLC and Buffalo Bills, LLC
Defendant: DCR Strategies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01406
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation for an extension of time. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/22/2019. (KM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration Stipulation Requesting Adjournment by Buffalo Bills, LLC, Hockey Western New York, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCR Strategies, Inc.. (Hambidge, Todd)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DCR Strategies, Inc. on 12/11/2018, filed by Buffalo Bills, LLC, Hockey Western New York, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buffalo Bills, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hockey Western New York, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Second Half, LLC for Hockey Western New York, LLC.. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #4 Motion to sever and dismiss or, alternatively, to stay and compel arbitration. Responses are due on or before January 23, 2019. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary, and, if so, inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/2/2019. (PFC)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by DCR Strategies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Hambidge, Todd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DCR Strategies, Inc. (KM)
December 7, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
December 7, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Buffalo Bills, LLC, Hockey Western New York, LLC. to #1 Complaint Summons filed by Buffalo Bills, LLC, Hockey Western New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reina, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCR Strategies, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3295920, filed by Hockey Western New York, LLC, Buffalo Bills, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Reina, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hockey Western New York, LLC, et al v. DCR Strategies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hockey Western New York, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffalo Bills, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCR Strategies, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Ryan Hambidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?