Pietrzak et al v. Skyway Trucking Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane M Ervolino and David T Pietrzak
Defendant: Skyway Trucking Service, LLC and Chang P. Hanoy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00112
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #6 Letter. Defendant Skyway Trucking Service, LLC has requested that the Court institute a stay in light of an order issued by a Nevada state court on January 18, 2019. (Dkt. 6 at 1). The Court requests that Plaintiffs notify it by letter on or before February 13, 2019, as to whether they have any objection to the requested stay. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/06/19. (KAC) (A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to defendant Hanoy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Letter filed by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC as to Chang P. Hanoy, Skyway Trucking Service, LLC . (Lim, Tomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC. Amendment to #4 Order to Show Cause, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Response to Damages Demand, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 1/28/19 Court Order, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Sergio Fernandez, #6 Exhibit Traffic Collision Report, #7 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service)(Lim, Tomas) Modified on 2/4/2019 (KLH).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that Skyway is directed to show cause, through the filing of an Amended Notice of Removal with supporting affidavit(s) on or before Friday, February 1, 2019, as to why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/28/2019. Copy mailed to Chang P. Hanoy at 18831 North Lyford Drive, Katy, TX 77449.(KLH)
January 25, 2019 Remark: Copy of #3 Text Order mailed to Chang P. Hanoy at 18831 North Lyford Drive, Katy, TX 77449 (JMM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case is reassigned to the Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford for all further proceedings. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on January 25, 2019. (JMM)
January 22, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
January 22, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC. to #1 Notice of Removal, E-Filing Notification, filed by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, #4 Exhibit Second Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, #5 Exhibit Defendant Skyway's Verified Answer, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service as to Defendant's Skyway's Verified Answer, #7 Exhibit Stipulation to Amend Pleadings, #8 Exhibit Defendant Skyway's Amended Verified Answer, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Service as to Defendant Skyway's Amended Verified Answer, #10 Exhibit Notice of Removal advising State Court, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal advising State Court, #12 Exhibit Affidavit of Service as to Notice of Removal advising State Court)(Lim, Tomas)
January 22, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: Filing attorney is directed to file an Index identifying each document filed and/or served in the state court action, pursuant to LR 81(a)(3)(A). Please file the Index utilizing the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. (KLH)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC from Erie County, case number 810120/2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3339392), filed by Skyway Trucking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Lim, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pietrzak et al v. Skyway Trucking Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyway Trucking Service, LLC
Represented By: Tomas Blaquera Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang P. Hanoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M Ervolino
Represented By: Joseph Donald Morath, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T Pietrzak
Represented By: Joseph Donald Morath, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?