United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence Center, New York and The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York
Claimant: Lauren Seitz, Five Star Bank and Anthony Gerace
Case Number: 1:2019cv00193
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM by Anthony Gerace. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lauren Seitz Statement 28 USC 1746 (White, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM Forfeiture by Lauren Seitz. (White, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. White on behalf of Lauren Seitz (White, Justin)
April 4, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Document missing claimant's electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature re #9 CLAIM by Anthony Gerace. (SG)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM by Anthony Gerace (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas) Modified on 4/4/2019 to correct filer (SG).
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN executed re Complaint (SG)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM by Five Star Bank. (SG)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Kaufman, Richard)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Issued Forfeiture Hearing set for 5/3/2019 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (SG)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
February 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Kaufman on behalf of United States of America (Kaufman, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint For Forfeiture against 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence Center, New York, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Complaint For Forfeiture Against Real Property)(Kaufman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence Center, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lauren Seitz
Represented By: Justin S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Five Star Bank
Represented By: John K. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Gerace
Represented By: Thomas J. Eoannou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?