United States of America v. $11,484.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $11,484.00 United States Currency
Claimant: Anthony Banks
Case Number: 1:2019cv00230
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 11:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/22/2019. (SDW)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/15/2019. (CMD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM by Anthony Banks. (KLH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony Banks. (KLH)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date March 27, 2019. (Kane, Mary)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem returned executed on 3/6/2019. (KM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
February 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
February 25, 2019 Arrest Warrant in Rem issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 5/17/2019 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (KLH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $11,484.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $11,484.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,484.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Banks
Represented By: Franklin R. Pratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?