Cash v. Columbia Sussex Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cash
Defendant: JOHN DOE, Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott, Columbia Sussex Corporation and . John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00278
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hugh B Scott
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTTEXT ORDERJoint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2019. Upon receipt, this Court will determine whether to accept the proposed Scheduling Order deadlines or set a Scheduling Conference.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/11/2019. (DRH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Hugh B. Scott, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/10/2019. (CMD)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Sussex Corporation. (Greystone, Jonathan)
March 13, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
March 11, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Together with Affirmative Defenses by Columbia Sussex Corporation.(Greystone, Jonathan)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
March 4, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Greystone, Jonathan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 800262/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3376443), filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greystone, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. Columbia Sussex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cash
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Kopacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott
Represented By: Jonathan Justin Greystone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Sussex Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Justin Greystone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?