United States of America v. Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00
Case Number: 1:2019cv00604
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned executed as to Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00. (SG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Process Receipt and Return as to Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00. (KLH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date June 11, 2019. (Kane, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
May 30, 2019 Arrest Warrant in Rem issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 7/24/2019 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. William M. Skretny. (SG)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00, filed by Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Jewelry Valued at $34,900.00
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?