West v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Marcus West
Defendant: Correction Officer Turner, Correction Officer . John Doe and Correction Officer Larcen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00608
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff, dated 6/26/19, to The Court (SG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff, dated 6/26/19, to The Court (SG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Nicole Thompson-Williams, dated 6/26/19, to Marcus West. (SG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Larcen, Turner,. John Doe against Marcus West. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 6/26/19. (SG) Copy mailed to plaintiff.
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; case shall be administratively terminated; plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing no later than thirty days from the date of this order if he wishes to reopen the action and shall include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed and signed Prison Certification or the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative; upon receipt of the new motion or the filing fee, the Clerk of Court shall re-open the case. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/25/19. (SG) Plaintiff mailed order and blank motion form with Authorization.
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Letters from Plaintiff, dated 6/16/19 and 6/17/19, to Clerk of Court, status letter sent. (SG)
May 10, 2019 Pro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline. (SG)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus West.(SG)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against. John Doe, Larcen, Turner, filed by Marcus West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer . John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Larcen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?