Brown v. Ludtka, et al
Plaintiff: Dezhean Brown
Defendant: J. Ludtka, John Doe, John/Jane Doe and Thomas Schrage
Case Number: 1:2019cv00634
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to update address from Dezhean Brown, dated 6/30/2019. (KM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dezhean Brown.(KLH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of J. Ludtka, John Doe, John/Jane Doe, Thomas Schrage against Dezhean Brown. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 5/28/2019. (KM)
May 28, 2019 Remark: A copy of #3 Order, #4 Judgment and a blank forma pauperis form mailed to plaintiff. (KM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. If Brown wishes to reopen this action, he shall notify the Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order. The writing shall include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis, or the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/23/2019. (KM) Modified on 5/28/2019 (KM).
May 20, 2019 Plaintiff mailed a Pro Se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dezhean Brown.(KM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, John/Jane Doe, J. Ludtka, Thomas Schrage, filed by Dezhean Brown.(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ludtka, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ludtka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dezhean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?