Safeco National Insurance Company v. Kemper Independence Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Safeco National Insurance Company
Defendant: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00635
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 11:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/8/2019. (SDW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Leslie G. Foschio for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on June 28, 2019. (JMM)
June 28, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(NRE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Leslie G. Foschio The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 6/27/2019. (NRE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kemper Independence Insurance Company.(Dunbar, Joseph)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America for Safeco National Insurance Company.. (Potashner, Marshall)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kemper Independence Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation, Corporate Parent Trinity Universal Insurance Company for Kemper Independence Insurance Company.. (Dunbar, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
June 17, 2019 Answer due date updated as to Kemper Independence Insurance Company answer due 7/3/2019 (KLH)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER acknowledging #7 Stipulation filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 6/14/2019. (KLH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dunbar, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Dunbar on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dunbar, Joseph)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco National Insurance Company. Kemper Independence Insurance Company served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Potashner, Marshall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (KM)
May 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
May 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
May 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Potashner, Marshall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America for Safeco National Insurance Company.. (Potashner, Marshall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kemper Independence Insurance Company $ 400 receipt number 0209-3454099, filed by Safeco National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potashner, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco National Insurance Company v. Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph W. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco National Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall T. Potashner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?