Owusu v. Feeley et al
Defendant: William P. Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Kevin K. McAleenan and Jeffery Searls
Petitioner: Samuel Owusu
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan and Thomas Feeley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00694
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER. Oral Argument re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus set for 8/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/25/2019. (CMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, #11 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IJ Bond Memorandum, #2 Exhibit BIA Bond Decison)(Moravec, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls. (Khalil, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DO Oliveri Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to DO Oliveri Declaration, #3 Declaration of DO Hobart)(Khalil, Adam)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls (Khalil, Adam)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this order the respondents shall file and serve an answer and a memorandum of law. The respondents may within 30 days of this order file instead of their answer a motion to dismiss the petition. The petitioner shall have 15 days upon receipt of the respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a response. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 petition)(KM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Letter filed . (Moravec, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Jeffery Searls on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on James P. Kennedy on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Kevin K. McAleenan on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Thomas F. Feeley on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on William P. Barr on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Moravec, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3466793.), filed by Samuel Owusu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTA, #2 Exhibit Bond Order, #3 Exhibit Bond Appeal Notice, #4 Exhibit Bond Appeal Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Administrative Bond Denial)(Moravec, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owusu v. Feeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Searls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Owusu
Represented By: Joseph David Moravec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?