Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Strut et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co. and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Mikhail Strut, M.D., Cheryle Hart, M.D., Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C. and Mikhail Strutsovskiy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00728
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hugh B Scott
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER RE: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cheryle Hart, M.D., Mikhail Strut, M.D., Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C.Plaintiff will file any responding papers on or before 8/13/2019. Defendants will file any reply papers on or before 8/30/2019. The Court will deem the motion submitted on papers after 8/30/2019 per Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b).SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/16/2019. (GAI)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Hugh B. Scott, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/11/2019. (CMD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cheryle Hart, MD, Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C., Mikhail Strut, MD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - 2012 Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - 2012 Docket)(Knoer, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cheryle Hart, MD, Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C., Mikhail Strut, MD. (Knoer, Robert)
July 1, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Knoer on behalf of All Defendants (Knoer, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Max Gershenoff, Esq., is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/18/2019. (CMD)
June 14, 2019 Verified admission to the New York State Bar for Attorney Max Gershenoff. (NRE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3484688.) Attorney Database Information Form. (Gershenoff, Max)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3484688.) Electronic Case Filing System Registration Form. (Gershenoff, Max)
June 13, 2019 E-Filing Notification: regarding #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice; CM/ECF Registration form and Attorney Database Information form in support of motion for pro hac vice admission were not provided. Action needed: please complete the forms found on our website at www.nywd.uscourts.gov and re-file using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (NRE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3484688.) by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Max Gershenoff in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Admission Petition, Admission Sponsor Affidavit from Joshua D. Smith, Esq., Attorney's Oath, and Civility Principles Oath)(Gershenoff, Max)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cheryle Hart, MD, Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C., Mikhail Strut, MD. (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued)(KM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Summons - Cheryle Hart, M.D.. (Goldberg, Ryan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Summons - Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C.. (Goldberg, Ryan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Summons - Mikhail Strut, M.D. a/k/a Mikhail Strutsovskiy, M.D.. (Goldberg, Ryan)
June 5, 2019 E-Filing Notification:(2) Proposed Summons and Rider. Action required. Filer should file a summons for each party. The summons should not include a date and should be file using the (Continuation of Exhibits) event. (KM)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
June 5, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (KM)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co... (Goldberg, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 RICO STATEMENT by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Goldberg, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cheryle Hart, MD, Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C., Mikhail Strut, MD $ 400 receipt number 0209-3473608, filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Claims Submitted)(Goldberg, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Strut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Strut, M.D.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryle Hart, M.D.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation Services, P.C.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Strutsovskiy
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ryan Craig Goldberg
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Ryan Craig Goldberg
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: Ryan Craig Goldberg
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Craig Goldberg
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?