Buczek v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Case Number: 1:2019cv00747
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Griswold, Robert)
July 11, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Griswold on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Griswold, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designation of Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 BK 196 Designation of Record on Appeal, #2 BK 176 Notice of Appeal, #3 BK 169 Order, #4 BK 119 Motion, #5 BK 127 Objection, #6 Claim 6-1) (SG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding #2 Bankruptcy Appeal. (KLH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-11401. File received, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Order BK dkt 169, #4 Motion BK dkt 119, #5 Claim 6-1)(KLH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Deborah Ann Buczek.(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?