Eagle System, Inc. v. Mod-Pac Corp.
Plaintiff: Eagle System, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10, Mod-Pac Corp. and ABC Corps. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00817
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by Mod-Pac Corp. is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/10/2019. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Mod-Pac Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Angelino, Sharon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Angelino on behalf of Mod-Pac Corp. (Angelino, Sharon)
June 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
June 21, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-17062.
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Mod-Pac's Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York, in lieu of dismissal ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/19/2019. (km) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 OPINION filed. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/19/2019. (km) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by MOD-PAC CORP. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification Attorney Certification and Exhibit List)(GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mike King, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KAYAL, DARREN) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by MOD-PAC CORP.. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit)(GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MOD-PAC CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2019. (km) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOD-PAC CORP.. (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mod-Pac Corp... (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. MOD-PAC CORP. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (KAYAL, DARREN) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOD-PAC CORP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 12, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Darren Kayal on 12/11/2018 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. (KAYAL, DARREN) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOD-PAC CORP, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9231302) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAYAL, DARREN) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle System, Inc. v. Mod-Pac Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mod-Pac Corp.
Represented By: ANTHONY J. GOLOWSKI, II
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle System, Inc.
Represented By: DARREN CHRISTOPHER KAYAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?