West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Mackinnon et al
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as Nominee for Accredited Home Lenders, Inc., Citibank (South Dakota), NA, Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00888
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by West Coast 2014-7, LLC re #17 Answer to Counterclaim (Weinreb, Alan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Verified Reply to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Weinreb, Alan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to the #11 Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 11/1/2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/22/2019. (KAC) (A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to defendants Thomas Mackinnon and Maria Mackinnon)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against West Coast 2014-7, LLC by Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon. (SG)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by letter by West Coast 2014-7, LLC.(Weinreb, Alan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER re #11 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before 9/3/2019. The Court will not hold oral argument on the motion, but will decide the motion based on the papers submitted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/15/19. (KAC) (A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to defendants Thomas Mackinnon and Maria Mackinnon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Citibank (South Dakota), NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (NRE) (Copies mailed to Defendants in default.)
August 13, 2019 Clerk's Default Not Entered against Defendants Thomas MacKinnon, Maria MacKinnon. Plaintiff notified. Reason: Answer timely filed. (NRE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by West Coast 2014-7, LLC against Citibank (South Dakota), NA, Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default, #2 proposed Clerk's Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Weinreb, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas Mackinnon.(SG)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon.(SG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Citibank (South Dakota), NA served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Maria Mackinnon served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Thomas Mackinnon served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Citibank (South Dakota), NA, Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (SG)
July 9, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
July 9, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIRMATION signed by Alan H. Weinreb, Esq. filed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b. (Weinreb, Alan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 proposed Summons)(Weinreb, Alan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citibank (South Dakota), NA, Maria Mackinnon, Thomas Mackinnon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as Nominee for Accredited Home Lenders, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3509622, filed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit E, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice)(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Mackinnon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as Nominee for Accredited Home Lenders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Mackinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mackinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?