Buczek v. Keybank N.A.
Appellee: Keybank N.A.
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Case Number: 1:2019cv00972
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal of Record on Appeal designating unperfected appeal. (KLH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keybank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Keycorp for Keybank N.A... (Hawkins, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S Hawkins on behalf of Keybank N.A. (Hawkins, Jonathan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (KLH) Copy mailed to Appellant.
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-11401-CLB. File received, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 Copy of BK Docket Sheet re Entry #204, #2 Application to Proceed IFP)(KLH) Modified on 7/24/2019 (KLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Keybank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Keybank N.A.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Peters
Represented By: Jonathan S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?