Precious Plate, Inc.v. Olin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Precious Plate, Inc.
Defendant: K.A. Steel Chemicals, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation d/b/a Oxychem, Olin Corporation, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd., Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Westlake Chemical Corporation, Shintech Incorporated, Formosa Plastics Corporation and Occidental Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00990
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/25/2019. (RAZ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Justin N. Boley, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/25/2019. (RAZ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 25, 2019 Verified admission to the Illinois State Bar for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler (CGJ)
September 25, 2019 Verified admission to the Illinois State Bar for Attorney Justin N. Boley (CGJ)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Kenneth A. Wexler ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3586335.) . (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit)(Gellman, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Justin N. Boley ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3586272.) . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit)(Gellman, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 SECOND E-Filing Notification: regarding #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Kenneth A. Wexler and #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Justin N. Boley. The Court's forms must be used or if retyped be identical. Action Required: Please resubmit the following forms using the Continuation of Exhibits event for each Attorney seeking Pro Hac Vice admission: Petition form, Admission Sponsor form. (CGJ)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/19/2019. (KLH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting (7) Motion for Entry of Case Management Order No. 2 in case 1:19-cv-00975-EAW-MJR and granting (5) Motion for Entry of Case Management Order No. 2 in case 1:19-cv-00990-EAW-MJR. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00975-EAW-MJR, 1:19-cv-00990-EAW-MJR(RAZ)
September 16, 2019 E-Filing Notification: regarding #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Kenneth A. Wexler and #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Justin N. Boley. The Court's forms must be used or if retyped be identical. Action Required: Please resubmit the following forms using the Continuation of Exhibits event for each Attorney seeking Pro Hac Vice admission: Petition form, Admission Sponsor form. (CGJ)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Kenneth A. Wexler ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3586335.) by Precious Plate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit B - Oaths, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gellman, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Justin N. Boley ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3586272.) by Precious Plate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit B - Oaths, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gellman, Ryan)
September 11, 2019 Hon. Michael J. Roemer added. (KLH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER of Referral. The instant related cases (Civil Action No. 19-cv-975; Civil Action No. 19-cv-990) are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Roemer for hearing and disposition of the pending motions for entry of a proposed case management order and of all other pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/04/2019. (KAC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order by Precious Plate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - CMO, #4 Exhibit B - Lowey firm resume, #5 Exhibit C - Wexler firm resume, #6 Exhibit D - Colucci firm resume, #7 Certificate of Service)(Gellman, Ryan)
September 4, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 DECLARATION filed by Precious Plate, Inc.: This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document in proper form, using the motion event. (KLH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Precious Plate, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed CMO, #2 Exhibit B - Lowey firm resume, #3 Exhibit C - Wexler firm resume, #4 Exhibit D - Colucci firm resume, #5 Memorandum in Support)(Gellman, Ryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Precious Plate, Inc.. (Gellman, Ryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Formosa Plastics Corporation, Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., K.A. Steel Chemicals, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Olin Corporation, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd., Shintech Incorporated, Westlake Chemical Corporation. (KLH)
July 30, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Formosa Plastics Corporation, Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., K.A. Steel Chemicals, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation d/b/a Oxychem, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Olin Corporation, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd., Shintech Incorporated, Westlake Chemical Corporation $ 400 receipt number 0209-3534387, filed by Precious Plate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., #3 Summons - Formosa Plastics Corporation, #4 Summons - K.A. Steel Chemicals, #5 Summons - Occidental Chemical, #6 Summons - Occidental Petroleum, #7 Summons - Olin Corporation, #8 Summons - Shin-Etsu Chemical, #9 Summons - Shintech Incorporated, #10 Summons - Westlake Chemical)(Gellman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precious Plate, Inc.v. Olin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.A. Steel Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation d/b/a Oxychem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shintech Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formosa Plastics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Plate, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan L. Gellman
Represented By: Justin N. Boley
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?