Yeates v. Harris
Plaintiff: Angela B. Yeates
Defendant: Joshua G. Harris
Counter Defendant: D. Taylor
Case Number: 1:2019cv01064
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 INDEX of State Court Proceedings by Joshua G. Harris (SG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 COUNTERCLAIM against Angela B. Yeates, D. Taylor, filed by Joshua G. Harris.(SG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua G. Harris. (KM)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that within thirty days of the date of this order, Harris shall comply with the requirements of Rule 81(a) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. All further proceedings shall be stayed for thirty days until Harris has done so. Once Harris complies with this order, this Court will address his motions to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/14/19. (SG) Plaintiff mailed copy of order.
August 14, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Document was replaced with correct motion re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (SG)
August 13, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
August 12, 2019 Pro Se Packet Handed to Plaintiff at the Counter which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (SG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Harris.(SG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joshua Harris from City of Buffalo Traffic Violations Agency, case number 19060315., filed by Joshua Harris.(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeates v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela B. Yeates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?