Hicks-Bailey v. USA
Petitioner: Damien C. Hicks-Bailey
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01177
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Richard J Arcara
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin G. Bish on behalf of USA (Bish, Justin)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER as to Damien C. Hicks-Bailey regarding 73 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Damien C. Hicks-Bailey: that the United States Attorney shall file and serve an Answer to the Petition and a Memorandum of Law, as directed, no later than October 18, 2019; that Petitioner shall have twenty days upon receipt of the Answer to file a response and memorandum of law; and that Respondent may file a motion for a more definite statement or a motion to dismiss the petition within twenty days of the date of this order, as directed. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 9/5/2019. Copy mailed to Movant.(KLH)
September 4, 2019 Motion to Vacate filed in case 16-CR-40. All docketing will be entered on the criminal case. (KLH)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Richard J. Arcara. (KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks-Bailey v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Justin G. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damien C. Hicks-Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?