United States of America v. 9579 Cobblestone Drive, Clarence, New York
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 9579 Cobblestone Drive, Clarence, New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv01210
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date Octobre 26, 2019. (Kane, Mary)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Lori Leone. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lana, Anthony)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM by Anthony Leone. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lana, Anthony)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Post and Walk - by United States of America regarding #1 Complaint. (KLH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real property (KLH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real property (KLH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real property (Kane, Mary)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Issued. (KLH)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against 9579 Cobblestone Drive, Clarence, New York, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint For Forfeiture Against Real Property, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 9579 Cobblestone Drive, Clarence, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9579 Cobblestone Drive, Clarence, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?