United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Butt Construction Company, Inc. et al v. Old Republic Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Butt Construction Company, Inc., United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Butt Construction Company, Inc. and The United States of America
Defendant: Danny Thompson Inc. and Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01222
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT FOR SUM CERTAIN BY DEFAULT in favor of Butt Construction Company, Inc., The United States of America against Danny Thompson Inc.. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/6/2019. (KLH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Vacate by Danny Thompson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #3 Rule 7.1 Statement, #4 Appearance of Counsel, #5 Certificate of Service)(Roscetti, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Entry of Default Judgment for Sum Certain by Butt Construction Company, Inc. against Danny Thompson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit and Statement of Amount Due, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Gismondi, Geffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Danny Thompson Inc. Copy sent to Defendant. (KLH)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Butt Construction Company, Inc. against Danny Thompson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of entry of default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed entry of default, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Gismondi, Geffrey)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Company.. (Friedman, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Old Republic Insurance Company.(Friedman, Adam)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Returned Executed, extending time of defendant Old Republic Insurance Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Friedman, Adam)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America, Butt Construction Company, Inc.. Danny Thompson Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019; Old Republic Insurance Company served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed for Danny Thompson Inc.)(Gismondi, Geffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Danny Thompson Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company. (KLH)
September 13, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
September 13, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
September 13, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danny Thompson Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company $ 400 receipt number 0209-3584479, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Butt Construction Company, Inc., Butt Construction Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Summons - Old Republic Insurance Company, #4 Summons - Danny Thompson Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gismondi, Geffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Butt Construction Company, Inc. et al v. Old Republic Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butt Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Butt Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Thompson Inc.
Represented By: James C. Roscetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam P. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?