Bushen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bushen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01230
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his amended motion (Docket # 5) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiffs papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/22/19. (NNR)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Bushen.(Bernhardi, William)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete. Plaintiff indicates that he is not employed and resides with his wife, three minor children and father-in-law. He states that his family's monthly expenses of $2170 are paid by his wife's income of $3384.96. Plaintiff also indicates that he resides with his father-in-law who is retired, but does not indicate if his father-in-law contributes to any of the household expenses. Also, plaintiff states that he resides with his three minor children, however, it is unclear from his application whether or not he has included expenses associated with the care for the children in the total monthly expenses listed in his motion. Based on the lack of sufficient information, the Court cannot determine whether plaintiff has set forth sufficient indications of indigency, thus, plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion is DENIED. Plaintiff has until October 30, 2019 to (1) re-file his application using the Court's standard form with all of the relevant information included, or (2) pay the $400.00 filing fee. If plaintiff has not complied with either of these options by October 30, 2019, the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case without prejudice and without further order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/30/19. (NNR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 copy of complaint)(KLH)
September 13, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
September 13, 2019 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (KLH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Bushen.(Bernhardi, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jeremy Bushen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bernhardi, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bushen
Represented By: William C. Bernhardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?