Bull v. 22nd Century Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Bull
Defendant: John T Brodfuehrer, 22nd Century Group, Inc. and Henry Sicignano III
Petitioner: Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto and Joseph Berterman
Case Number: 1:2019cv01285
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00409.
September 16, 2019 Case transferred to Western District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint Stipulation and Order Transferring Case to the Western District of New York and Tolling Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/4/2019. (Please Note: As per Local Civil Rule 83.1., In a case ordered transferred from this District, the Clerk, unless otherwise ordered, shall upon the expiration of seven (7) days effectuate the transfer of the case to the transferee court.) (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of New York by 22nd Century Group, Inc., John T. Brodfuehrer, Henry Sicignano III. (Friedman, Jonathan) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/31/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE 22ND CENTURY INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the #20 Letter submitted by Plaintiffs Joseph Noto, Garden State Tire Corp., and Stephens Johnson (the "22nd Century Investor Group"), the 22nd Century Investor Group is DIRECTED to file an amended proposed order appointing the 22nd Century Investor Group as Lead Plaintiff and approving its selection of Pomerantz LLP as Lead Counsel by no later than Thursday, August 1, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/30/2019. (Strohmeier, Seguin) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 Letter by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court understands that Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed the related case (No. 19-cv-553). In light of that dismissal, Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Consolidate is moot. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/25/2019. (Strohmeier, Seguin) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Calandra on behalf of Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto (aty to be noticed) (Calandra, Brian) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Once the MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff have been decided, counsel for Defendants shall file a motion proposing a firm date by which to respond to the complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/4/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hale Friedman on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Friedman, Jonathan) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by 22nd Century Group, Inc., John T. Brodfuehrer, Henry Sicignano III. (Friedman, Jonathan) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled for May 22nd before the undersigned is adjourned without date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/16/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth Avery Spencer on behalf of Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto (aty to be noticed) (Spencer, Garth) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Joseph Berterman re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion) (Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Alexander Hood on behalf of Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto (aty to be noticed) (Hood, J. Alexander) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Letter re: clerical error of filing by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE 22ND CENTURY INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume) (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE 22ND CENTURY INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed by Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson, Joseph Noto. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE 22ND CENTURY INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL by Joseph Noto, Garden State Tire Corp., Stephens Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Joseph Berterman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Joseph Berterman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on May 22, 2019 in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than May 20th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/22/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 2:19-cv-00748. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv553. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11122111 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Bull. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nyed on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bull v. 22nd Century Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garden State Tire Corp.
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Garth Avery Spencer
Represented By: Brian Calandra
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephens Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Garth Avery Spencer
Represented By: Brian Calandra
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Noto
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Garth Avery Spencer
Represented By: Brian Calandra
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Berterman
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bull
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Brodfuehrer
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22nd Century Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Sicignano III
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?