Pardiwala v. Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zahir Pardiwala
Defendant: Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC and Daniel Bienko, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv01389
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christina Clair Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC. Copy mailed to Defendant in default. (KLH)
December 2, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 MOTION for Entry of Default: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. NO ACTION REQUIRED. (KLH)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC by Zahir Pardiwala.(Hilton, Jonathan) Modified on 12/2/2019 (KLH).
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zahir Pardiwala. Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Hilton, Jonathan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC, Daniel Bienko, III. (KLH)
October 23, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
October 23, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
October 23, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Christina Clair Reiss. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3619792, filed by Zahir Pardiwala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pardiwala v. Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahir Pardiwala
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Capital Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bienko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?