Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Pierce
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Stephan R. Pierce
Case Number: 1:2019cv01397
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Freedom Mortgage Corporation against Stephan R. Pierce. (Attachments: #1 NMA)(Vargas, Stephen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Stephan R. Pierce served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stephan R. Pierce. (SG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Proposed Summons for all Defendants filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 17, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. # 2 Proposed Summons is the Corporate Disclosure Statement. Refile Summons using the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies.(SG)
October 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
October 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
October 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephan R. Pierce $ 400 receipt number 0209-3621987, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 301-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan R. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?