Buczek v. New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Appellee: New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Case Number: 1:2019cv01401
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the parties shall file and serve their respective briefs in accordance with the time frames set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/21/2019. Copy mailed to Appellant.(KLH)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Proceedings held on October 1, 2019, before Judge Carl L. Bucki. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Contact Info 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2020. (KLH)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Transmittal of Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Bk Dkt# 259, #2 Bk Dkt# 216, #3 Bk Dkt# 228, #4 Bk Dkt# 238, #5 Bk Dkt# 269) (KLH)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (SG) Plaintiff/Appellant and Defendant/Apellee mailed copy of Notice Modified on 10/24/2019 (SG).
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-11401-CLB. File received, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 BK No. 242 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Albert J. Mogavero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?