Buczek v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Case Number: 1:2019cv01402
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Proceedings held on October 1, 2019, before Judge Carl L. Bucki. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Contact Info 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (KLH)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Transmittal of Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Bk Dkt# 126, #2 Bk Dkt# 60, #3 Bk Dkt# 73, #4 Bk Dkt# 85, #5 Bk Dkt# 102, #6 Bk Dkt# 103, #7 Bk Dkt# 122, #8 Bk Dkt# 125, #9 Bk Dkt# 139, #10 Bk Dkt# 140, #11 Bk Dkt# 87) (KLH)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Griswold, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Griswold on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Griswold, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Copy mailed to Appellant.) (KLH)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane Christopher Buczek.(KLH)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11441. File received, filed by Shane Christopher Buczek. (Attachments: #1 BK Transmittal, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 BK Doc #60 Motion, #4 BK Doc #102 Order)(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Chatwin
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?