Schneider v. Mast
Plaintiff: Brian J. Schneider
Defendant: Jayme Mast
Case Number: 1:2019cv01505
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER.The claims Plaintiff asserts in his complaint may be dismissed without a trial if he does not respond to these motions. Plaintiff must submit any papers in opposition to Defendants' motions no later than December 20, 2019. Reply papers must be filed by January 3, 2020. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01504-EAW, 1:19-cv-01505-EAW, 1:19-cv-01506-EAW(KM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jayme Mast. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits A-E, #3 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Kathryn)
November 13, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, and ADR Notification. (KLH)
November 7, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
November 7, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Jayme Mast. to #1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet) filed by Jayme Mast. (Smith, Kathryn)
November 7, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jayme Mast: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (KLH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jayme Mast from Batavia City Court Small Claims Part, case number SC-000107-19/BT., filed by Jayme Mast. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibits, #3 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme Mast
Represented By: Kathryn L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?